Trustees SOUTH WEST GRID FOR LEARNING TRUST
Charity number: 1120354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEILA MARGARET SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Karuna Nain | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Daniells | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Elizabeth Porter | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andy David Phippen | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE BRISCOMBE | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMY BRITTAN | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BOND | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MCDONALD | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW COGHLAN | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.