BECKERY ISLAND REGENERATION TRUST

Charity number: 1120490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £60.80k £9.78k £10.73k £6.85k £9.78k
Total expenditure £44.81k £6.24k £14.21k £29.42k £3.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A