BECKERY ISLAND REGENERATION TRUST

Charity number: 1120490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Christopher Manning Trustee 06 September 2018 None on record
IAN CHRISTOPHER TUCKER Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH Received: On time
FORGET-ME-NOT-CLUB Received: On time
GERARD TUCKER Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
EDWARD WILLIAM HIGGINS Trustee None on record
Denise Caroline Abbott Trustee 15 August 2019 None on record
Melissa Lee Taylor Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN ALLEN Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
STEPHEN HENDERSON Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
EMMA GEORGE Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
NANCY HOLLINRAKE Trustee None on record