KATHMANDU CONTEMPORARY ARTS CENTRE

Charity number: 1121118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 09 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 20 April 2018 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 07 February 2018 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required