NEW HEIGHTS WARREN FARM COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1120869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 July 2017 On time Download