INFECTION PREVENTION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1120063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 October 2016 On time Download