Trustees CHRIST CHURCH COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 1119877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Ellen Winder Nichols | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hoi Yan Irene Lu | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Cline | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Vorbach | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lida Cepuch | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNDEN EASTON | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hugh McGillivray Langmuir | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Keane Dalton | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.