Trustees WOMEN'S HEALTH IN SOUTH TYNESIDE
Charity number: 1119901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Key | Chair | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rowan Hewitt | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Estelle Daglish | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Kozaczek | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bullock | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Helen Taylor | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Shields | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
DONNA DI STEFANO | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.