THE GOLDMAN SACHS CHARITABLE GIFT FUND (UK)

Charity number: 1120148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 16 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 15 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 15 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 15 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 15 March 2017 On time Download