JEWISH RESCUE & RELIEF COMMITTEE OF AGUDAS ISRAEL WORLD ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1120311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 March 2019 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 March 2019 124 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 December 2016 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 05 December 2016 35 days late Download