BARFORD COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity number: 1122038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.73k £22.24k £23.82k £16.92k £44.28k
Total expenditure £8.99k £500 £500 £2.45k £6.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A