Accounts and annual returns CFYDC (CHANCE)

Charity number: 1121341
Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 106 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 12 May 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 12 May 2023 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 14 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 26 May 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 26 May 2021 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 26 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window