FRIENDS OF ST KEYNA PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1130206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 14/08/2016 04/08/2017 04/08/2018 04/08/2019 04/08/2020
Total gross income £7.11k £8.43k £10.36k £10.72k £4.69k
Total expenditure £8.44k £7.64k £6.46k £9.52k £3.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A