Accounts and annual returns HANDS OF LOVE UK

Charity number: 1123685
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time