Financial history HANDS OF LOVE UK

Charity number: 1123685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £45.68k £38.34k £31.85k £44.36k £17.44k
Total expenditure £50.50k £36.73k £33.60k £45.76k £24.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A