THE MAUDSLEY PHILOSOPHY GROUP TRUST

Charity number: 1120868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £554 £261 £15.04k £146 £15
Total expenditure £15.73k £17.17k £18.90k £6.87k £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A