Financial history NATIONS LIGHT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1121392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.25k £16.38k £6.74k £5.45k £18.29k
Total expenditure £6.22k £15.60k £9.09k £11.10k £6.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A