THE BRITAIN-NIGERIA EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1120876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required