THE BRITAIN-NIGERIA EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1120876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.53k £14.86k £11.71k £27.15k £10.73k
Total expenditure £20.32k £0 £30.60k £52.95k £21.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A