Trustees SOLIHULL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1120597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Damian James Kelly Chair 23 January 2012
None on record
HELEN ELLIS Trustee 06 January 2020
THE SOLIHULL CHILDRENS SPECIAL NEEDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
JOB'S CLOSE RESIDENTIAL HOME FOR THE ELDERLY
Received: On time
THE BIRMINGHAM BOYS AND GIRLS UNION
Received: On time
Dr Anne Susan Houghton Trustee 06 January 2020
THE CORNERSTONE WORKS LTD
Received: On time
Carol McNidder Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Ian Ralph FCA Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Gill Tillman Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Fenella Elizabeth Mary De Minckwitz Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Ian Green Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Judith Anita Hetherington FCA Trustee 01 September 2017
THE GUARDIANS OF ST ALPHEGE PARISH CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Received: On time
DR ANDREW JOHN BURTENSHAW MBChB MRCP Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
JAMES ANDREJ ADIE Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
PROF SWAREN PREET SINGH MBBS MD Trustee 19 September 2016
None on record
DR HEATHER MARY GAY PhD Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
PAUL GEOFFREY NEWBY Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record