THE FUTURE VISION TRUST - ALMUSTAKBAL

Charity number: 1123778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.20k £1.75k £3.50k £2.00k £1.00k
Total expenditure £910 £1.15k £3.00k £1.50k £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A