ST MARY'S SOUTH BADDESLEY CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1120561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.43k £1.21k £1.38k £1.42k £1.49k
Total expenditure £4.43k £1.22k £7.35k £9.70k £2.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A