WOODHOUSE COMMUNITY HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1120929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required