WOODHOUSE COMMUNITY HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1120929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £14.46k £11.49k £17.33k £21.78k £15.74k
Total expenditure £10.62k £11.90k £10.48k £22.48k £15.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £300
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A