Financial history THE DAVID AND CLAUDIA HARDING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120878
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £45.12k £5.01m £25.12m £53.93m £25.01m
Total expenditure £5.36m £9.48m £6.67m £100.43m £585.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £5.01m £25.11m £53.93m £25.00m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £5.53k £6.31k £0 £6.24k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £9.48m £6.67m £100.43m £585.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £11.42k £3.60k £3.60k £41.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £9.47m £6.65m £0 £538.89k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0