Financial history FOREST FARM PEACE GARDEN

Charity number: 1123031
Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £85.83k £80.04k £70.16k £75.12k £78.84k
Total expenditure £70.02k £67.50k £67.49k £75.35k £88.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.50k N/A £1.00k N/A N/A