MISSION POSSIBLE UK

Charity number: 1120971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £105.94k £145.03k £172.65k £164.78k £266.24k
Total expenditure £110.45k £146.14k £149.44k £168.92k £178.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A