Financial history DOWNRIGHT EXCELLENT

Charity number: 1120863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £154.99k £160.56k £192.40k £243.99k £240.72k
Total expenditure £148.00k £159.20k £189.61k £220.02k £209.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A