JADWIGA WANDA RADA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.05k £4.84k £7.91k £8.41k £9.15k
Total expenditure £2.70k £2.30k £1.12k £1.23k £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A