MEDINA GHOSIA EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1121982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 08 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required