THE BOAZ TRUST HAMPSHIRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1121699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 03 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 02 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download