Financial history CROYDON COMMITMENT LTD

Charity number: 1122878
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £32.23k £43.65k £43.68k £67.72k £29.11k
Total expenditure £44.61k £46.21k £55.51k £48.97k £31.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £9.18k