Trustees CROYDON COMMITMENT LTD

Charity number: 1122878
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mrs K Glass Chair 15 October 2013
None on record
ROBERT DICKINSON Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
IAN PALMER Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
CHARLES HUMPHREYS Trustee 31 May 2020
None on record
Karen Chillman Trustee 17 October 2018
None on record
SEAN DORMAN Trustee 19 November 2013
None on record
JULIE DAKIN Trustee
None on record