THE COMPANY OF ARTS SCHOLARS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1121954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.55m £106.26k £142.33k £151.08k £163.37k
Total expenditure £61.66k £56.31k £89.40k £94.51k £117.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.51m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £43.44k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £1.47m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £42.99k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.43k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £38.92k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £18.38k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A