Dogfen lywodraethu DANZACTION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26 JULY 2007, AS AMENDED ON 26 JANUARY 2008. AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 17 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02 OCT 2020 as amended on 06 Jul 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR INDIVIDUALS, BY PROVIDING A SAFE SPACE, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMS OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATION AND OTHER ACTIVITIES TO HELP INDIVIDUALS, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF DANCE & THE ARTS , SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CORNWALL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.