Financial history NEWBIGGIN-BY-THE SEA HERITAGE PARTNERSHIP LTD

Charity number: 1121602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £75.02k £174.88k £75.73k £58.39k £69.80k
Total expenditure £30.48k £123.78k £27.81k £28.24k £12.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.28k N/A £3.94k