GREAT WESTERN AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY

Charity number: 1121300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 April 2017 On time Download