KNIGHTSBRIDGE SCHOOL EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £181.53k £188.04k £185.94k £146.25k £192.20k
Total expenditure £41.92k £80.85k £70.39k £73.36k £58.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A