UNIVERSITY JEWISH CHAPLAINCY

Charity number: 1126031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 24 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 24 May 2017 On time Download