UNIVERSITY JEWISH CHAPLAINCY

Charity number: 1126031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £756.21k £661.11k £640.16k £1.53m £960.97k
Total expenditure £773.98k £823.52k £869.65k £883.34k £787.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £96.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £756.21k £661.11k £640.16k £1.53m £864.83k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £96.14k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £773.98k £823.52k £869.65k £883.34k £787.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £114.54k £6.62k £6.72k £5.76k £7.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0