DE NEDERLANDSE REGENBOOG SCHOOL

Charity number: 1121703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £105.27k £87.73k £116.36k £126.72k £118.22k
Total expenditure £82.64k £99.35k £108.32k £110.90k £103.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.25k £0 N/A N/A N/A