LLANHILLETH MINERS INSTITUTE LTD

Charity number: 1128924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £304.94k £235.07k £345.74k £398.08k £364.55k
Total expenditure £288.95k £258.74k £298.77k £381.60k £364.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.21k £0 N/A £52.58k £36.84k