JOSEPH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1121841
Charity reporting is overdue by 126 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 126 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 126 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 02 June 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 20 August 2019 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 08 December 2019 252 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 03 August 2018 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 28 April 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 31 August 2017 153 days late Download