JOSEPH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1121841
Charity reporting is overdue by 122 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £14.37k £37.55k £22.25k £32.65k £24.01k
Total expenditure £14.46k £31.56k £25.09k £33.39k £24.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A