Governance CONSTABLE COUNTRY CHILDCARE
Charity number: 1122021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 18 December 2007: Standard registration
- 25 July 2014: Funds received from 1015979 CHERRY BLOSSOM NURSERY
- 31 August 2016: Funds received from 1153846 CHERRY BLOSSOM NURSERY EAST BERGHOLT
- 05 April 2017: Funds received from 1023189 STUTTON SEALS PLAYGROUP
- 05 September 2023: Funds received from 1159203 ABC PRESCHOOL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- BROOKLANDS YOUNG EXPLORERS (Previous name)
- ST MICHAEL'S WITH BROOKLANDS YOUNG EXPLORERS CHILDCARE PROVISION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.