Financial history EAST LONDON MOSQUE TRUST

Charity number: 1122613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.64m £3.69m £4.03m £4.38m £4.39m
Total expenditure £2.85m £3.11m £3.32m £3.37m £3.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.25m £1.18m £1.22m £1.18m £1.32m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.36m £1.01m £1.67m £1.77m £2.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £946.50k £976.20k £1.01m £776.54k £885.14k
Income - Other £77.05k £529.31k £130.50k £652.25k £189.74k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.45m £1.97m £2.19m £2.27m £2.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £341.34k £394.08k £477.07k £428.76k £511.44k
Expenditure - Governance £76.35k £83.02k £82.02k £81.66k £82.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £221.05k £273.67k £258.51k £236.97k £234.03k
Expenditure - Other £57.96k £740.03k £659.57k £662.85k £718.25k