PARTNERSHIP OF HOME AND BRINDISHE LEE

Charity number: 1121973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.29k £8.99k £3.25k £17.12k £8.40k
Total expenditure £10.55k £10.06k £4.05k £10.39k £10.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A