Accounts and annual returns THE AURUM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1121227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 18 April 2018 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window