TRUE BELIEVERS MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1123490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2016 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020
Total gross income £8.54k £16.79k £3.58k £2.84k £5.15k
Total expenditure £5.04k £16.88k £7.55k £3.91k £4.14k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A