KHADIMABAD WELFARE TRUST (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1122479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £119.09k £8.62k £8.29k £7.61k £3.60k
Total expenditure £4.98k £117.39k £10.39k £6.63k £894
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A